Johnson v. Frac Tech Services Ltd
Plaintiff: Markiba Johnson
Defendant: Frac Tech Services Ltd
Case Number: 4:2009cv00739
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 220 Order entered, plaintiffs' case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/2011. (dmn)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER denying as moot 202 Motion for Judgment; denying as moot 211 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/11. (kpr)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER allowing Andy Edwards and Charles Veazey, Frach Tech employees, to bring in cell phones, including smart phones and laptops into the Courthouse for the trial of this matter. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/17/2011. (mkf)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER that Frac Tech's 166 Motion for Reconsideration is denied; granting in part and denying in part motions in limine 139 153 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/27/11. (vjt)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 120 MOTION to Quash; Frac Tech may depose Meier, Ramsey, and Druba on January 5th or a mutually convenient date before January 17th; granting 116 Motion for Voluntary Non-suit of Separate Plaintiffs' Joel Martinez and Michael Pope; Joel Martinez and Michael Pope terminated. Attorney John T. Holleman, IV terminated. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/30/2010. (mkf)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs Aguilera, Bounds, Hawkins and Holguin's claims againt deft with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/10. (bkp)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 54 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice and Consent to Join Collective Action filed by Frac Tech Services Ltd.. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/4/10. (bkp)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER, with respect to 2 NOTICE of Related Case; Case Number 4:09-cv-679-JLH, this Court will defer to Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes with respect to whether judicial economy requires that the two cases proceed before a single Judge & thus should be consolidated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/22/09. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Frac Tech Services Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markiba Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frac Tech Services Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?