Jackson v. Paslidis et al

Plaintiff: Tom Jackson
Defendant: Nick Paslidis, Donna Soodalter-Toman and Arkansas Foundation for Medical Care
Movant: USA
Case Number: 4:2009cv00812
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE having been notified that a settlement has been reached. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/3/2012. (pag)
January 3, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion to Dismiss; granting 46 Motion to Amend; Jackson must file his second amended complaint within 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/3/12. (vjt)
November 14, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Unseal the Record; granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Amended Complaint; defts must file their answer to the amended complaint within ten days from the entry of this Order; granting 34 Motion to Extend Time; Jackson has up to and including 1/19/12 to serve the individual defts. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/14/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Paslidis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Paslidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Soodalter-Toman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Foundation for Medical Care
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Represented By: Amber Wilson Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: USA
Represented By: Joyce R. Branda
Represented By: Renee Brooker
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Represented By: Carolyn B. Tapie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Jackson
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?