Beech v. First Franklin Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Harvey Beech
Defendant: First Franklin Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Shapiro & Kirsch LLP, Wells Fargo N A and D Denise Griffin
Case Number: 4:2009cv00826
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL 21 releasing the Lis Pendens incorporated in plaintiff's amended complaint as of February 22, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/18/10. (bkp)
February 25, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/25/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 17 19 Motions to Dismiss and dismissing this case without prejudice as to all defendants. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
December 15, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and directing the plaintiff to amend his complaint and file it by January 13, 2010, at 5 p.m.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/15/09. (bkp)
November 30, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc directing plaintiff to respond by 12 noon, Monday, December 14, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beech v. First Franklin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Beech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franklin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Adrienne Lee Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Kirsch LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo N A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Denise Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?