Lewis v. Comcast Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Howard J Lewis, III
Defendant: Comcast Corporation, Comcast of Little Rock Inc and Comcast of Arkansas/Florida/Louisiana/Minnesota/Mississippi/Tennessee Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00859
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses the complaint and all claims in this action against defts with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/21/10. (vjt)
November 9, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/9/10. (vjt)
May 26, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 22 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; appointing Brian Curtis Hogue to represent pltf in all further proceedings; the Clerk is directed to send pltf and counsel a copy of this Order and a copy of Local Rule 83.7; pltf's 23 Motion to Delay Rule 26(f) Conference and Report Deadlines is also GRANTED; Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/28/2010; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/12/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/26/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Comcast Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard J Lewis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Little Rock Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Arkansas/Florida/Louisiana/Minnesota/Mississippi/Tennessee Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?