Lewis v. International BioResources

Plaintiff: Terri Lewis
Defendant: International BioResources
Case Number: 4:2009cv00884
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and denying all pending motions. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/12/11. (kpr)
November 4, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Compel and directing Lewis to provide responses to IBR's first set of interrogs and requests for production on or before December 6, 2010; the parties are directed to schedule Lewis's deposition on or before December 20, 2010; and continuing the bench trial. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/4/10. (bkp)
March 11, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss claims for age discrimination and sex discrimination with prejudice; and allowing Lewis to amend her complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/11/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. International BioResources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lewis
Represented By: Ralph M. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International BioResources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?