Exigence LLC v. Catlin Underwriting Agency US Inc et al

Plaintiff: Exigence LLC
Defendant: Catlin Underwriting Agency US Inc, Certain Underwriters Syndicated through Lloyds of London, John Does and Courtney Baylark
Case Number: 4:2009cv00915
Filed: December 8, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Plaintiff's voluntary Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/21/13. (kpr)
January 24, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Joint Motion to Stay; CASE IS STAYED until the order of dismissal in the related state court case becomes final; Baylark's request for certification of an interlocutory appeal and request to pursue a claim for attorneys' fees are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/24/11. (vjt)
November 22, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: trade secret and/or confidential or proprietary information. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/22/2010. (thd)
October 15, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Deft Baylark's 66 Motion for Relief is GRANTED; Baylark is excused from filing pretrial materials required under the Court's Scheduling Order; 68 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines is GRANTED to the extent that the deadline for dispositive motions is extended up to and including 1/3/11. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/15/10. (vjt)
August 26, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft Baylark's 53 Motion for Leave to File a Cross-claim and 41 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/26/10. (vjt)
June 1, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the joint motion for protective order 36 38 is GRANTED to the extent that the parties are directed to postpone the depositions of corporate representatives until the Court decides Deft Baylark's motion to compel 41 ; granting the parties' joint motion to extend deadlines 34 ; Discovery due by 8/1/2010; Motions due by 9/1/2010; the Jury Trial scheduled for 11/1/10 is CONTINUED, and a new trial date will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/1/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exigence LLC v. Catlin Underwriting Agency US Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exigence LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Underwriting Agency US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters Syndicated through Lloyds of London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Baylark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?