Bryant v. Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Donald A Bryant
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2009cv00941
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7429 IRS: Tax Jeopardy Assessment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 118 Order Dismissing Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/26/10. (bkp)
August 25, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/25/10. (bkp)
August 18, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing deft to produce to plaintiff any records it has of plaintiff's 1099 forms for the years spanning 2000 to 2009 and to submit an order of dismissal with prejudice certifying that all of those forms and said order will be promptly entered; and finding as moot all pending motions 36 38 46 65 66 83 86 92 96 97 98 100 103 106 26 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/18/10. (bkp)
June 11, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Plaintiff's MOTION to discharge his appointed counsel. James Phillips is hereby discharged as counsel for Donald A Bryant. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/11/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?