Telecom Decision Makers Inc v. Access Integrated Networks Inc et al

Plaintiff: Telecom Decision Makers Inc
Defendant: Access Integrated Networks Inc and Birch Communications Inc
Movant: Navigator Telecommunications, LLC
Case Number: 4:2009mc00004
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/6/11. (kpr)
August 2, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Telecom's Motion to Compel the deposition testimony of non-party, Navigator Telecommunications, LLC, and ordering that this testimony be sealed; granting Telecom all reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, cause d by Navigator's failure to provide the foregoing deposition testimony, and directing Telecom to submit a fee petition within 10 days of the supplemental oral deposition; and, denying 20 Navigator's Motion for Reconsideration of the 7/16/2010 Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/2/10. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 8/2/2010 to correct linkage and the description of the document filed.) (thd)
July 16, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/16/10. (bkp)
June 9, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Navigator's Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/9/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telecom Decision Makers Inc v. Access Integrated Networks Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telecom Decision Makers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Integrated Networks Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birch Communications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Navigator Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By: James Andrew Vines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?