Horn v. Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc et al

Plaintiff: Robyn Horn
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor Corporation and Does
Case Number: 4:2010cv00090
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Toyota's 15 Motion to Stay this action pending a ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/10. (vjt)
April 5, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for J.R. Whaley to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for pltf in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/5/10. (vjt)
March 29, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, and Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc answer due 4/16/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/29/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Horn
Represented By: John Randall Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?