Frazier et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: William Richard Frazier and Frazier Insurance Agency Inc
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Life Insurance Company, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Variable Life Insurance Company and Colonial Insurance Company of California
Case Number: 4:2010cv00168
Filed: March 16, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses the complaint and all claims in this action against defts with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/11. (vjt)
June 30, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Natalie Furniss, Jeff Spillyards, Seth Abel, and Bridget Riddell to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Little Rock, between 7/11/11 and 7/15/11, subject to the provisions of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/30/11. (vjt)
June 27, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the reasons stated on the record at the hearing on 6/24/11, the 39 Motion for Sanctions and for Default Judgment on Count III by the defts and the Cross Motions for Summary Judgment 41 45 are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/11. (vjt)
December 9, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/9/10. (vjt)
August 25, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part defts' 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; the motion is GRANTED with respect to the claims re breach of contract for wrongful termination and promissory estoppel; the motion is also GRANTED re Count I of the counterclaim; the motion is DENIED as to the claim of breach of contract for failure to pay deferred compensation payments and Counts II through V of the counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/25/10. (vjt)
August 10, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 MOTION for Natalie T. Furniss and Quintin F. Lindsmith to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for defts in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/10/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richard Frazier
Represented By: Danny R. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frazier Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: Danny R. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Variable Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Insurance Company of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?