LasikPlus Murphy MD PA et al v. LCA-Vision Inc

Plaintiff: David Murphy and LasikPlus Murphy MD PA
Defendant: LCA-Vision Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv00178
Filed: March 24, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 45 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/17/11. (vjt)
June 8, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Craig P. Sanders to Appear pro hac vice as additional counsel for pltfs in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/8/11. (vjt)
March 30, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 37 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/30/11. (vjt)
March 4, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part LCA's initial partial motion to dismiss 7 ; LCA's subsequent motion 29 to dismiss Count Ten of pltf's first amended complaint is granted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/4/11. (vjt)
May 10, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions for Marcia Voorhis Andrew 14 and Adam Charles McNeely 15 to Appear pro hac vice as additional counsel for Deft LCA-Vision Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/10/10. (vjt)
April 14, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Bradford D. Box and Todd D. Siroky to Appear pro hac vice as additional counsel for pltfs in this matter. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/14/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LasikPlus Murphy MD PA et al v. LCA-Vision Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCA-Vision Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Murphy
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LasikPlus Murphy MD PA
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?