Glaze v. Byrd et al

Plaintiff: Chariell Ali Glaze
Defendant: Karl Byrd, Bobby Brown, John Randall and Gary Andrews
Case Number: 4:2010cv00219
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 106 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defts. Plaintiff's claims against defts Byrd, Brown and Randall are dismissed with prejudice. Mr. Glaze� 39;s claims against defts Childs and Andrews in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Mr. Glaze may proceed on his claims against defts Childs and Andrews in their individual capacities. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/25/12. (kpr)
December 20, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending dispositive motions ddl to on or before January 3, 2012. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/20/11. (kpr)
July 1, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a jury trial setting on the docket of Judge James M. Moody is now appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/1/11. (kpr)
February 22, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING for 47 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Gary Andrews, Demontrel L Childs, Karl Byrd, John Randall, Bobby Brown. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/22/11. (bkp)
May 10, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing, with prejudice, plaintiff's claims that defendants interfered with his right to access the courts under the First Amendment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaze v. Byrd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chariell Ali Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?