Fullington v. Pfizer Inc et al

Plaintiff: Joyce Fullington
Defendant: Pfizer Inc, Wyeth LLC, Schwarz Pharma Inc, Pliva USA Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Alaven Pharmaceutical LLC and Mutual Pharmaceutical Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv00236
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Drew
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 115 Opinion and Order enetered separately today, Joyce Fullington's 110 second amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/2014. (ks)
January 15, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a brief explaining specifically what the defendants could have done to comply with Arkansas law, as well as how doing so would not have violated federal law. The plaintiff's brief must be filed within 21 days from the entry of this Order. The defendants may file a response within 14 days after the plaintiff files her brief. Please be concise and to the point. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 01/15/2014. (rhm)
July 17, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 92 Order entered this date, and the Court's previous rulings in this matter, judgment is hereby entered in favor of the defts on all claims asserted by Joyce Fullington; pltf's complaint and amended complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/17/12. (vjt)
May 23, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defts' 78 Joint Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, except as to pltf's claim of inadequate warning against PLIVA for the period after February 2009; as to that claim, the defts' motion to dismiss is converted to a motion for summary judgment; pltf will have 14 days from the entry of this Order to present evidence that she consumed PLIVA's metoclopramide after February 2009. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/23/12. (vjt)
February 21, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 80 MOTION to Continue Trial Date of 4/16/12 and for Stay of Action; CASE IS STAYED pending a ruling on defts' 78 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/21/12. (vjt)
December 12, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 62 Joint Motion to Dismiss; pltf's claims against PLIVA Inc and Mutual Pharmaceutical Company Inc are dismissed without prejudice; pltf's 65 Motion for Relief from Judgment is denied; pltf may file a motion for leave to amend complaint as directed within 21 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/12/11. (vjt)
August 8, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 56 MOTION TO LIFT STAY filed by Joyce Fullington; defts are directed to file their motion to dismiss within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/8/11. (vjt)
March 9, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 MOTION to Substitute Robert M. Sexton and Michael Rainwater as counsel of record for pltf in place of George R. Wise, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/9/11. (vjt)
February 18, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Joint Motion for Continuance of Jury Trial scheduled for 6/20/11 and for a Stay; STAYING CASE until the Supreme Court issues its decision in the referenced cases; a new scheduling order will be entered setting this action for trial and providing new deadlines consistent with this ORDER OF STAY. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/18/11. (vjt)
September 17, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Pfizer, Wyeth, Schwarz and Alaven with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/17/10. (bkp)
August 25, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Henninger S. Bullock and Andrew J. Calica to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel in this action for defts Alaven Pharmaceutical LLC and Schwarz Pharma Inc. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/25/10. (vjt)
August 17, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motions for Kathleen E. Kelly 35 and Geoffrey M. Coan 36 ao Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel in this action for deft Mutual Pharmaceutical Company Inc. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/17/10. (vjt)
July 26, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/26/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fullington v. Pfizer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Fullington
Represented By: Alexandra V. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pliva USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaven Pharmaceutical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Pharmaceutical Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?