Richards v. Lumpkin et al

Plaintiff: Martin Richards
Defendant: Lumpkin and Stewart
Case Number: 4:2010cv00245
Filed: April 16, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
0 Judge: Henry L. Jones
1 Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 81 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/5/11. (kpr)
February 17, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 54 47 Witness Lists filed by Martin Richards; and directing the ADC to ensure the plaintiff's attendance at the hearing scheduled for March 8, 2011, together with a copy of his medical records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/17/11. (bkp)
February 16, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/16/11. (bkp)
January 20, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff's Motions to Compel 58 ; granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and directing defts to submit their responses to plaintiff's discovery requests by January 26, 2011; and that Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Subpoena (de#54) shall be construed as a Request for a Witness and shall be re-docketed as such. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/20/11. (bkp)
December 7, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to re-docket 47 MOTION for Order filed by Martin Richards as a Request for Witnesses at the March 8, 2011 Pre-Jury Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/7/10. (bkp)
November 15, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/15/10. (bkp)
September 9, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to the 22 MOTION to Compel filed by defts within 10 days of the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to forward to plaintiff a copy of docket entry #22, including attachments. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/9/10. (bkp)
September 7, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 14 Motion for Order filed by Martin Richards. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/7/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Lumpkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?