Harris-Fields v. Dolgencorp Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tisha Harris-Fields
Defendant: Dolgencorp Inc, Dollar General Partners, Dolgencorp of New York Inc and Dolgencorp of Texas Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv00267
Filed: April 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Joint Motion for Order Approving Individual Settlements filed in the lead case 1:10cv00024, dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James E. Gritzner on 2/22/12. (hph)
January 19, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating defts Dollar General Partners, Dolgencorp of New York Inc and Dolgencorp of Texas Inc pursuant to 43 Stipulation of Dismissal filed in the LEAD CASE 1:10-cv-00024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/19/11. (vjt)
December 1, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION consolidating these 32 cases for filings and discovery purposes only; designating 1:10-cv-00024-JEG as the LEAD CASE; directing that all subsequent filings must be filed in the lead case only, and must be electronic, utilizing the Courts CM/ECF system; all counsel of record must register on CM/ECF; the Clerk is directed to annotate the docket sheets for the 31 related cases to state that the docket sheet for the lead case reflects all filings common to all 32 cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 12/1/10. (vjt)
October 13, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding preparations for status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/13/10. (vjt)
August 9, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying transfer. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 8/9/10. (bkp)
May 28, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/28/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris-Fields v. Dolgencorp Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp Inc
Represented By: Joel S. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Partners
Represented By: Joel S. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp of New York Inc
Represented By: Joel S. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp of Texas Inc
Represented By: Joel S. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Harris-Fields
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?