Taylor v. Tenant Tracker Inc

Plaintiff: Catherine L Taylor
Defendant: Tenant Tracker Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv00282
Filed: April 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Tenant Tracker's Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing Taylor's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/4/11. (hph) (Docket text modified on 11/4/2011 to correct the description of the document filed, and case closing information removed.) (thd).
January 14, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 20 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/14/11. (vjt)
December 15, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 deft's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Tenant Tracker Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine L Taylor
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenant Tracker Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?