Arkansas, State of v. U S Fidelis Inc et al

Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Defendant: U S Fidelis Inc, Darain E Atkinson and Cory C Atkinson
Case Number: 4:2010cv00378
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Arkansas, State of against U S Fidelis Inc re 9 Order entering the Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction between plaintiff and defendant, US Fidelis, Inc. The case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/1/12. (kpr)
October 1, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entering the Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Between Plaintiff and Defendant US Fidelis, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/1/12. (kpr)
March 14, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a pleading within 20 days of the entry of this Order regarding the status of this action as it pertains to separate deft U.S. Fidelis Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/14/11. (vjt)
November 8, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION between Plaintiff and Defendant Cory Atkinson. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/8/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas, State of v. U S Fidelis Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Eric Barkley Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Fidelis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darain E Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory C Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?