Falcon v. CEMCO Inc et al

Plaintiff: Darrin Falcon
Defendant: CEMCO Inc, Manchester Tank & Equipment Company, Doe Corporation and John Does
Case Number: 4:2010cv00715
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing all claims and cross-claims with prejudice pursuant to the parties' settlements 172 170 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/3/13. (kpr)
March 14, 2013 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER scheduling a status conference on April 18, 2013, at 9:00 a.m., if indemnity is not resolved before then. A joint motion to dismiss would be appreciated by the Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/13. (kpr)
October 12, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending and supplementing the 153 Scheduling Order. Motions in limine now due 6/3/13; responses due 6/12/13; replies due 6/18/13. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/12. (kpr)
November 3, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 123 125 Motions to Dismiss Party and dismissing all claims and cross-claims by and against deft YoungDo without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/11. (kpr)
July 8, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 61 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 62 Motion for Relief; denying as moot 69 Motion to Stay; granting 73 Motion to Approve/Approval, as amended. Falcon's oral motion for leave to amend is also granted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/8/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcon v. CEMCO Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Falcon
Represented By: Connie L. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEMCO Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Schlumberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester Tank & Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?