Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc v. Department of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff: Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 4:2010cv00721
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is entered dismissing plaintiff's claims as to fiscal years ending 2004, 2005, and 2007, and permanently enjoining the Secretary from enforcing 42 C.F.R. section 418.309(b) against Plaintiff for fiscal year ending 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/24/11. (kpr)
September 24, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and directing DHHS to stay its demand for repayment from SEARK and to pay SEARK for claims that come due after the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/24/10. (bkp)
August 17, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion for TRO and setting a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction for September 7, 2010, at 3:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/17/10. (bkp)
August 5, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for an ex-parte hearing on its 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/5/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc v. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc
Represented By: Don E. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?