Pitonyak Machinery Corporation v. Brandt Industries Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Pitonyak Machinery Corporation
Defendant: Brandt Industries Ltd and Brandt Agricultural Products Ltd
Case Number: 4:2010cv00772
Filed: July 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring the case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, Indianapolis Division, based upon the Court's previous 33 Order Staying Case and the Southern District of Indiana's Order denying Pitonyak's Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/15/11. (bkp)
January 13, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE, the 10 MOTION to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer filed by Brandt Agricultural Products Ltd, and Brandt Industries Ltd is granted to the extent that the case is STAYED until a ruling is made in the Indiana Case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/13/11. (vjt)
August 11, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/11/10. (bkp)
July 30, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Stipulation filed by Brandt Agricultural Products Ltd, Brandt Industries Ltd, Pitonyak Machinery Corporation, which the court interprets as a motion for extension of time; and granting defts up to and including August 27, 2010, to file a response to the pending complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/30/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitonyak Machinery Corporation v. Brandt Industries Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pitonyak Machinery Corporation
Represented By: Daniel T. Earle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandt Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandt Agricultural Products Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?