Hardin v. Duvall et al

Plaintiff: Jacob Lynn Hardin
Defendant: Aaron Duvall, James Dunham and Jefferson Faught
Case Number: 4:2010cv01073
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, though the Plaintiff has timely filed docket entry # 49 Witness List filed by Jacob Lynn Hardin, Mr. Kutcher, a potential witness resides in Lyman, Maine and the Court will not issue a sub poena for his appearance at the October 5, 2011 trial . Additionally, Plaintiff is currently housed at Johnson County Detention Center, though the Court has been orally informed that the Plaintiff is only being housed there as a courtesy, and he is actually in the legal custody of the Pope County Detention Center. Thus Defendants shall transport Plaintiff and his institutional file to the October 5, 2011 trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/07/2011. (kcs)
March 18, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to defts' motion for summary judgment 33 and a Statement of Disputed Material Facts within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/18/11. (kpr)
September 29, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Magistrate Judge Ray's proposed findings and partial recommended disposition. Harden may proceed with his excessive-force claim against Defendants Duvall, Patton, Paulicki, Gritton, Meyers, Martian, and Gibson. Hardin may also proceed with his inadequate-medical-care claim against Defendant Duvall; directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for all these Defendants; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summonses, complaint, amended complaint, Magistrate Judge Ray's Order, and this Order upon these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; and dismissing all other claims and Defendants without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/23/10. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. Duvall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Lynn Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Faught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?