Holmes v. Chesapeake Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jason E Holmes
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Chesapeake Exploration LLC, Chesapeake Midstream Gas Services LLC, Chesapeake Midstream Operating LLC, Chesapeake Operating Inc, Nomac Drilling LLC, Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC and MidCon Compression LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv01157
Filed: August 18, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Prairie
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT: IT IS ORDERED that the complaint, be, and it hereby is, dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement, and/or Consent Decree. If any party desires that the written settlement agreement be part of the record herein, it should be filed with the Court within twenty (20) days. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/14/2011. (dmn)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER referring the discovery issues discussed in the telephone conference on Tuesday, September 6, 2011, to Magistrate Judge Joe Volpe for resolution. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/7/11. (kpr)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER pursuant to a telephone conference held on May 31, 2011 regarding pltf's Interrogs and Requests for Production of Docs and directing defts to answer, as set forth in this Order. Defts shall produce all non-privileged materials sought by pltf's request for production No. 8 no later than Monday, June 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/2/11. (kpr)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss Chesapeake Energy Corporation; Chesapeake Exploration, LLC; Chesapeake Midstream Gas Services, LLC; Chesapeake Midstream Operating, LLC; Great Plains Oilfield Rental, LLC; and Midcon Compression, LLC without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/23/11. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Chesapeake Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason E Holmes
Represented By: Michael B. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Midstream Gas Services LLC
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Midstream Operating LLC
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating Inc
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomac Drilling LLC
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MidCon Compression LLC
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?