Madden et al v. Lumber One Home Center of Stuttgart Inc et al

Plaintiff: Terry Madden, Doug Wortman and Rebecca O'Bar
Defendant: Lumber One Home Center of Stuttgart Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv01162
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the [120 Order entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of Terry Madden and Rebecca O'Bar against Lumber One Home Center, Inc., in the amount of $34,013.43 ($33,366.61 for attorneys fees plus $646.82 in costs), plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.09% per annum, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/28/2014. (ks)
March 5, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 91 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Doug Wortman against Lumber One Home Center Inc in the amount of $2,339.20 plus post-judgment interest at the rate of 0.17 percent per annum. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/5/13. (vjt)
May 29, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 79 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/29/12. (vjt)
March 14, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to Jury Verdict 63 64 65 , judgment is hereby entered in favor of Lumber One Home Center Inc dismissing the complaint of Doug Wortman, Rebecca O'Bar, and Terry Madden with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/14/12. (vjt)
March 2, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motions in limine 48 50 are granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/2/12. (vjt)
February 22, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/12. (vjt)
January 12, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 31 Motion to Extend Motion Deadline; Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/12/12. (vjt)
December 2, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that pltfs' 5 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED, and pltfs' 8 Motion for Certification of an FLSA collective action is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/2/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madden et al v. Lumber One Home Center of Stuttgart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Madden
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Wortman
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca O'Bar
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumber One Home Center of Stuttgart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?