Buford v. Durhman et al

Plaintiff: Tony Andre Buford
Defendant: Kenny Durhman, Will Bascoe, Scott Bradley and Randy Murray
Case Number: 4:2010cv01163
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 45 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/6/2011. (dmn)
June 2, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to the 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Bradley, Kenny Dunham within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/2/11. (kpr)
February 24, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a dispositive motion within 30 days of this Order if they intend to rely on the defenses mentioned in their Answers to Complaint 21 15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/24/11. (kpr)
October 20, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Kenny Dunham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/20/10. (bkp)
October 19, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and denying in part 10 Partial Report and Recommendations; adopting the recommendation that the Plaintiff's cliams against Defendant Bradley for interfering with his legal mail be dismissed; declining to adopt the recomm ended dismissal of Plaintiff's allegations of racial discrimination; directing the Clerk of Court to correct the docket to reflect that Plaintiff's recently filed Objections be considered a Supplement to the Amended Complaint; and directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendant Bradley, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and Plaintiff's Supplement to Amended Complaint on Defendant Bradley without prepyament of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 10/19/10. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buford v. Durhman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Andre Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Durhman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Bascoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?