Wilson et al v. Morrilton Arkansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Wilson and Janet Wilson
Defendant: Morrilton Arkansas, City of, Bobby Kirby, Norbert Gunderman, Jr, James Clinton Murray, Dustin Levi Caudell, Morrilton Arkansas Police Department and John Does
Case Number: 4:2010cv01184
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Conway
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/22/11. (kpr)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part, as stated, 53 Defendants' Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/7/2011. (jct)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER ORDER re 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. All parties except Mayor Kirby should be prepared to go to trial next week as scheduled. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/6/11. (kpr)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/21/11. (kpr)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/13/11. (kpr)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss separate deft Morrilton Police Department with prejudice as a party to this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/25/10. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Morrilton Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Wilson
Represented By: Matthew W. Adlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Wilson
Represented By: Matthew W. Adlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrilton Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert Gunderman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Clinton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Levi Caudell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrilton Arkansas Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?