Korejko v. Best Buy Stores LP

Plaintiff: Jennine Leigh Korejko
Defendant: Best Buy Stores LP
Case Number: 4:2010cv01345
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Order Removing the Case from Trial Calendar; finding as moot 41 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The trial of this case is removed from the Court's November 15, 2011 docket. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/11/11. (kpr)
July 28, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Quash and extending the discovery ddl until August 19, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/28/11. (kpr)
July 27, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Reconsideration. The parties may agree on Dr. Rosenzweig if they wish, but the Court's earlier ruling remains in effect if an agreement is not reached. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/27/11. (kpr)
July 18, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 16 19 Motions to Compel. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/18/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korejko v. Best Buy Stores LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennine Leigh Korejko
Represented By: B. Jeffery Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores LP
Represented By: Robert Thompson Veon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?