Trenthem et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Plaintiff: James W Trenthem, III, Nisa Trenthem and Shane Faulkner
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv01528
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING THIS ACTION, pending resolution of or relief from the bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/25/12. (vjt)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER LIFTING STAY; a trial date will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/15/12. (vjt)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting deft's 79 Motion to Stay; all proceedings in this action are hereby STAYED pending a final decision on appeal in the case of Smith v. David H. Arrington Oil & Gas Inc., Eighth Circuit No. 10-3423. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/11. (vjt)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 MOTION to Substitute Ted Thomas as counsel of record for pltfs in this matter in place of J. Cody Hiland. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/17/11. (vjt)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying without prejudice Motions in Limine 56 58 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/27/11. (vjt)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER terminating the bench trial set for the week of November 1, 2010, a new trial date and scheduling ddls to be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/25/10. (bkp)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting pltfs' 62 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Case 1:09-cv-00017-JLH from the Northern Division to the Western Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas. (NEW CASE NO. 4:10-cv-01528-JLH) Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/21/10. (vjt)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER that 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/13/10. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trenthem et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Trenthem, III
Represented By: James Cody Hiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nisa Trenthem
Represented By: James Cody Hiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Faulkner
Represented By: James Cody Hiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?