Boyd v. Rausch Coleman Homes/Performance Group

Plaintiff: Wynter Adonnis Boyd
Defendant: Rausch Coleman Homes/Performance Group
Case Number: 4:2010cv01612
Filed: November 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 33 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Rausch Coleman Performance Group LLC dismissing the complaint of Wynter Adonnis Boyd with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/1/11. (vjt)
October 24, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response to deft's 23 Motion to Dismiss and 27 Motion for Summary Judgment by the close of business on Monday, October 31, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/24/11. (vjt)
September 21, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 20 Motion to Extend Deadline; Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/21/11. (vjt)
November 12, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 5 Order granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and complaint on the deft(s) in this action without costs. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/12/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Rausch Coleman Homes/Performance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynter Adonnis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rausch Coleman Homes/Performance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?