Bell v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Megyn Elizabeth Bell
Defendant: USA and Willis D Cronkhite, III
Case Number: 4:2010cv01641
Filed: November 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating this case with 4:11-cv-63, with this case being the lead case. All future filings should be styled as in this Order but filed only in the lead case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/16/11. (bkp)
January 7, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay pending a decision by a state court in related litigation. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/7/11. (bkp)
December 23, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Defendant Cronkhite's motion to interplead. To the extent that Cronkhite has already paid out $55,844.52 into the registry of the state court, those funds will be transferred to this court 9;s registry and held in an interest-bearing account pending the outcome of this litigation. Cronkhite's request to be preemptively discharged from any further liability in connection with the Trust is denied, and he shall remain a defendant in this action and is directed to provide an update on the status of the accounting ordered by the state court in January 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/23/2010. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megyn Elizabeth Bell
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis D Cronkhite, III
Represented By: Floyd M. Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?