Curtis v. Ward

Plaintiff: Michael Kent Curtis
Defendant: Janet Troutman Ward
Case Number: 4:2010cv01959
Filed: November 29, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 20 Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/23/11. (bkp)
February 14, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 17 Request for Extension of Time until 3/14/11 to respond to deft's 9 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/14/11. (vjt)
January 26, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff until February 9, 2011 to respond to the 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Janet Troutman Ward. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/26/11. (bkp)
January 13, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to respond to the 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Janet Troutman Ward on or before January 21, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/13/11. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kent Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Troutman Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?