J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Whitmore et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Defendant: Petrice Y Whitmore, Preston Levell Whitmore, Patrick Whitmore, Frank N Whitmore, Patti A Whitmore and Jazzi's LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv01987
Filed: December 3, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 521
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to 14 Notice of Settlement, these actions are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/8/12. (vjt)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES 4:09CV00553, 4:09CV00904, and 4:10CV01987; all future pleadings are to be filed in LEAD CASE 4:09CV00553; a single scheduling order will be entered in the consolidated cases, which will include new deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions, and a new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/24/11. (vjt)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER giving parties up to and including 10 days from the entry date of this Order to file any objections to consolidating this case with related cases 4:09CV00553 and 4:09CV00904. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/3/11. (vjt)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Thomas P. Riley to Appear pro hac vice as counsel of record for pltf in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/10. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Whitmore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Thomas P. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petrice Y Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Levell Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank N Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti A Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazzi's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?