Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc
Defendant: National Bank of Arkansas in North Little Rock
Case Number: 4:2010cv02012
Filed: December 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal 91 filed by the parties that they have reached a settlement; all claims in this matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/13/12. (vjt)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying deft's 72 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/23/12. (vjt)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 26 motion for summary judgment; deft's 29 sealed motion is denied; the issue of damages will proceed to trial; pltf's 20 motion to compel and 27 motion to disqualify as experts are denied; deft's 28 motion to allow depositions to be used as evidence is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/25/12. (vjt)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting deft's 69 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; the documents previously filed under seal will remain under seal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/23/12. (vjt)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting deft's 53 Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/8/12. (vjt)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/11. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc
Represented By: Katherine A. Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bank of Arkansas in North Little Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?