Shannon et al v. University of Arkansas Board of Trustees et al

Plaintiff: Melissa Shannon
Defendant: University of Arkansas Board of Trustees, B Allan Sugg, University of Arkansas, Daniel Rahn, Kevin Olden and University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences Board of Trustees
Case Number: 4:2010cv02044
Filed: December 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2012. (mcz)
July 17, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Enforce ; finding as moot 31 Motion for Order. The parties will reconvene with Judge Kearney within the next 60 days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/17/12. (kpr)
January 13, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon et al v. University of Arkansas Board of Trustees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Shannon
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Represented By: Sarah Lewis James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Allan Sugg
Represented By: Sarah Lewis James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas
Represented By: Sarah Lewis James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rahn
Represented By: Sarah Lewis James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Olden
Represented By: Sarah Lewis James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences Board of Trustees
Represented By: Sarah Lewis James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?