Duncan v. Martin et al

Plaintiff: Richard Jermain Duncan
Defendant: Randy Morgan, E Martin, Jr, G Clarke, Scruggs, Alder and Doc Holladay
Case Number: 4:2010cv02046
Filed: December 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 53 Memorandum and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/17/12. (vjt)
May 16, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the deft Thomas Adler and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint on deft at the address provided under seal without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/16/11. (kpr)
March 24, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts E. Martin, Jr., G. Clarke, Deputy Scruggs, Deputy Alder, and Chief Randy Morgan. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the Amended Complaint and summons on defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/24/11. (kpr)
January 7, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or an ifp application within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to plaintiff an application to proceed ifp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/11. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Morgan
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Martin, Jr
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Clarke
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scruggs
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jermain Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?