Baker v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Deborah Baker
Defendant: PNC Bank Corporation and Affiliates Long Term Disability Plan
Counter_claimant: PNC Bank Corporation and Affiliates Long Term Disability Plan
Counter_defendant: Deborah Baker
Case Number: 4:2011cv00015
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of PNC Bank Corporation and Affiliates Long Term Disability Plan against Deborah Baker in the amount of $1,580.00 re 101 Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/23/13. (kpr)
March 20, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Amend/Correct; Motion for Order; denying 58 Motion to Dismiss; granting 65 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 67 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/20/12. (kpr)
May 2, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 33 Motion to Amend Complaint; pltf may file her amended complaint within 5 days of the entry of this Order; pltf's 33 Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim, and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings are denied; pltf's 33 Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Order is granted; defts' 36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/2/11. (vjt)
April 1, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY regarding confidential information. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/1/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Baker
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank Corporation and Affiliates Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Gina DeSantis Wodarski
Represented By: Jim L. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PNC Bank Corporation and Affiliates Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Jim L. Julian
Represented By: Gina DeSantis Wodarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Deborah Baker
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?