Horn v. Manitex Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michael Kevin Horn
Defendant: Manitex Inc and Hi-Tech Pump and Crane Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00041
Filed: January 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 63 Order dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/5/12. (kpr)
January 12, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/12/12. (kpr)
December 7, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The Final Scheduling Order is amended to state that the ddl for adding parties and amending pleadings is February 15, 2012. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/7/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Manitex Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kevin Horn
Represented By: Robert M. Abney
Represented By: Robert W. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manitex Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech Pump and Crane Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?