Pettus v. Harvey et al

Plaintiff: Ida Pettus
Defendant: Elbert Harvey, Thomas Kimbrell, Laura Bednar and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 4:2011cv00046
Filed: January 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing plaintiff's complaint re 37 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/13/2012. (pag)
June 27, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (Document #4 in case 4:11CV00424) Joint Motion to Consolidate Case 4:11CV00424 with LEAD CASE 4:11CV00046; directing the Clerk to transfer said action to the docket of Judge Wright, who is currently presiding over Case No. 4:11CV00046. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/27/11. (vjt)
May 4, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting defts' 9 MOTION for Partial Dismissal; pltf's claims against the State of Arkansas and Kimbrell are dismissed; pltf's claims brought under 42 USC 1981 and the Arkansas Civil Rights Act are dismissed; Arkansas, State of and Thomas Kimbrell terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/4/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettus v. Harvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Pettus
Represented By: Robert A. Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elbert Harvey
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Represented By: Lori Freno-Engman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kimbrell
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Represented By: Lori Freno-Engman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Bednar
Represented By: Lori Freno-Engman
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Lori Freno-Engman
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?