Akin v. RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie M Akin
Defendant: RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings LLC, McLarty Landers LLC, Landers McLarty Bentonville Ford LLC and Landers McLarty Bentonville LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00067
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT pursuant to 39 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/3/12. (vjt)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting defts' 32 Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions; Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/29/11. (vjt)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AGREED ORDER Extending Deadline to Complete Discovery to 11/18/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/14/11. (vjt)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/23/11. (vjt)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AGREED ORDER Extending Deadlines; Discovery extended to 11/11/2011; Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/22/11. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akin v. RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie M Akin
Represented By: Kenneth S. Hixson
Represented By: Alanna Martinsky Fairrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings LLC
Represented By: John D. Coulter
Represented By: Daniel R. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLarty Landers LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Carter
Represented By: John D. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landers McLarty Bentonville Ford LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Carter
Represented By: John D. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landers McLarty Bentonville LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Carter
Represented By: John D. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?