Carlton v. Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department

Plaintiff: Danny Carlton
Defendant: Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department
Case Number: 4:2011cv00081
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/17/12. (kpr)
September 7, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss and giving plaintiff up to, and including, October 8, 2011, to complete service upon the defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/7/11. (kpr)
August 3, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to provide proof of serve as to deft within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/3/11. (kpr)
March 9, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the $350 filing fee as directed in the Court's Order 5 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/9/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlton v. Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?