Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Holmes et al

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Kristy L Holmes, Alvin J Johnson and Lisa S Gagnon
Case Number: 4:2011cv00157
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing the case with prejudice since the Clerk has distributed the policy proceeds and accrued interest to defts Holmes and Johnson, as ordered. 40 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/4/12. (kpr)
December 20, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The Court vacates its earlier instructions regarding the disbursement of funds (document no. 37, at 2). The Clerk is ordered to disburse the money this way: $72,109.25, plus 33.33% of any accrued interest, to Kristy L. Holmes; and $141,109.26, plus 66.67% of any accrued interest, to Alvin J. Johnson. The Court is further directed to file a statement confirming the disbursements and the exact amounts. Thereafter, the Court will enter Judgment dismissing the case with prejudice as agreed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/11. (kpr)
December 19, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to confirm the understanding of the Court as to the parties' two-thirds/one-third settlement agreement; terminating as moot 29 First MOTION for Discovery Take Deposition by Telephone and 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alvin J Johnson. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/11. (Attachments: # 1 Document deposit slip)(kpr)
December 13, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Hearing for 12/16/2011 10:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # B-155 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Holmes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy L Holmes
Represented By: Mary M. Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin J Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa S Gagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?