Russell v. St Bernards Hospital Inc

Plaintiff: Crissy Russell
Defendant: St Bernard's Hospital Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00177
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 59 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of St. Bernard's Hospital Inc, dismissing the complaint of Crissy Russell with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/4/11. (vjt)
February 24, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Western Division. The new case number will be 4:11CV00177-JLH. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/2011. (jct)
February 22, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, (Bench Trial rescheduled for 4/18/2011 at 9:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4D before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. St Bernards Hospital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crissy Russell
Represented By: John L. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Bernard's Hospital Inc
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?