Pickard v. Byrd
Plaintiff: Donny C Pickard
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Case Number: 4:2011cv00222
Filed: March 8, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT re 57 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/28/11. (kpr)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaints 2 8 , and this Order on deft Garner through the Arkansas State Police. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/9/11. (vjt)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to issue summons on defts. Jody Gieber, Christopher Lee Garner, David Potter, Lt. Potter, Todd Mize, Mark Mushrush, and William Tapley, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended c omplaint, and all attachments on defts. without prepayment of fees. Defts Gieber, Garner, and both Potters are to be served through the Pulaski County Sheriff's Dept.; and the defts Mize, Mushrush and Tapley should be served through the Faulkner County Sheriff's Dept.; dismissing the claim for loss of property without prejudice; and directing pltf. to notify the Court whether deft. Byrd should remain as a deft. in this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/22/11. (kpr)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Mr. Pickard a copy of this order and an application to proceed ifp, including the affidavit, certificate and account statement forms; and directing Mr. Pickard to return the application within 30 days from the date of this Order to continue this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/18/11. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickard v. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny C Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?