Roudachevski v. All-American Care Centers Inc et al

Plaintiff: Evgueni Roudachevski
Defendant: Jerry Rhoads and All-American Care Centers Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00230
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/13/2014. (ks)
August 2, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 77 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Evgueni Roudachevski against All-American Care Centers Inc, in the amount of $10,000 for the settlement installment due 7/1/12 and $1,000 for the se ttlement installment due 8/1/12, together with prejudgment interest at a rate of 6% per annum, from the due date of each installment through the date of judgment, and post-judgment interest from the date of judgment until paid at the rate of.17% per annum. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/2/12. (vjt)
May 15, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL granting 65 Joint Motion to Dismiss and for Retention of Jurisdiction; case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/15/12. (vjt)
March 13, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel of record for All-American to file a status report within 10 days from the entry of this Order regarding All-American's representation in this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/12. (vjt)
December 15, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER 48 regarding confidential information. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/11. (vjt)
October 17, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 39 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Without Prejudice against Defendant Jerry Rhoads; Rhoads' 35 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot; denying without prejudice 11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by All-American Care Centers Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/17/11. (vjt)
March 31, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 3 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/31/11. (vjt)
March 18, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing deft to brief the Court before 3/22/11 at 3:00 p.m. as to why this case should not be remanded to the Circuit Court of Pulaski County, Arkansas for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/18/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roudachevski v. All-American Care Centers Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Rhoads
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-American Care Centers Inc
Represented By: Debby Thetford Nye
Represented By: Edward T. Oglesby
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evgueni Roudachevski
Represented By: Janet L. Pulliam
Represented By: Jamie Fugitt
Represented By: Benjamin David Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?