White v. Ollar et al

Plaintiff: Charles Bruce White
Defendant: Gault, Loder, Pulaski County Detention Facility, Faulkner County Detention Center, Karl Byrd, Lynn Ollar, Doc Holladay and John Does
Case Number: 4:2011cv00251
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 154 Order dismissing the case and deying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/8/12. (kpr)
July 9, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to the 116 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Karl Byrd within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/9/12. (kpr)
May 1, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 82 Motion for Order to Show Cause; granting 95 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall provide to Defendant a signed medical authorization within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/1/12. (kpr)
April 17, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot pltf's 86 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/17/12. (vjt)
April 10, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Motion to Compel. The Clerk is directed to forward doc. no. 85, together with the attachment, to Plaintiff. Defts shall respond to pltf's motion to compel medical records within ten days of the date of this Order, and Deft Byrd shall respond to pltf's motion for order within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/10/12. (kpr)
October 5, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Sanctions; granting 44 Motion for More Definite Statement. Deft Doe will not be required to file a response to pltf's complaint until pltf can more clearly identify him. When pltf is able to identify deft Doe, he shall notify the Court in the form of a Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/5/11. (kpr)
September 22, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the defts to file a Response to 36 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles Bruce White within 10 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to file a Response to Defts' Motion for More Definite Statement within 10 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to forward to Plaintiff a copy of the Defts' Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/22/11. (kpr)
July 6, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Does, Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility, Faulkner County Detention Center, Sgt. Gault, and Deputy Loder, for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/6/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Ollar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Ollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bruce White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?