Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Inc v. Bank of the Ozarks et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Inc
Defendant: Bank of the Ozarks, Carolyn R Geels, Brent D Geels, Terence E Renaud and Renaud Family Limited Partnership
Case Number: 4:2011cv00280
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Terence E Renaud against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Inc in the amount of $5,000.00. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/2/12. (vjt)
February 22, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the findings of fact and conclusions of law announced from the bench at the close of trial, judgment is entered in favor of defts on the claims of pltf; pltf's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/12. (vjt)
January 19, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 46 Motion to Compel is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/19/12. (vjt)
December 12, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 51 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline; Discovery due by 12/30/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/12/11. (vjt)
August 8, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting Terence E. Renaud's 6 Motion to Dismiss; pltf's claims against Renaud are dismissed without prejudice; granting in part and denying in part 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Renaud Family Limited Partnership, Carolyn R Geels, Bank of the Ozarks; the 31 33 Motions to Strike the defts' reply to pltf's response are denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/8/11. (vjt)
April 25, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se deft Brent D. Geels to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve deft Geels by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Inc v. Bank of the Ozarks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Inc
Represented By: Joseph E. Jess Sweere
Represented By: Mary Galchus Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the Ozarks
Represented By: Gregory M. Hopkins
Represented By: Frank Stewart Headlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn R Geels
Represented By: Frank Stewart Headlee
Represented By: Gregory M. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent D Geels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence E Renaud
Represented By: Frank Stewart Headlee
Represented By: Gregory M. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaud Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Frank Stewart Headlee
Represented By: Gregory M. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?