Brown v. Blackstock et al

Plaintiff: Ricky Brown
Defendant: Givens, Blackstock and Ira Furlow
Case Number: 4:2011cv00291
Filed: April 4, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Brown's 2 Complaint is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the parties' settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/3/2012. (dmn)
January 6, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Defendants must file within 30 days either a Joint Motion to Dismiss or a Motion for an Exention of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/06/2012. (kcs)
May 9, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Ray's Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition. Brown may proceed with his excessive-force claims against Blackstock, Givens, and Doe in their individual capacities. All other claims and defendants ar e dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); granting 9 Brown's motion for service; identifying Ira Furlow as John Doe; directing the Clerk to issue the summons and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summonses and complaint on Defendants Blackstock, Givens, and Furlow without prepayment of fees, costs, or security. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/9/11. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Blackstock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?