Crop Production Services Inc v. Gibbs Farming Partnership et al

Plaintiff: Crop Production Services Inc
Defendant: Veda Agco Inc, Gibbs-Helton Farms Inc, Silva Agco Inc, Daphne Gibbs, Jason Chevrome Helton and Gibbs Farming Partnership
Case Number: 4:2011cv00319
Filed: April 14, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Cross
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 67 Order entered on 7/15/2013, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff Crop Production Services, Inc. against Defendant Jason Chevrome Helton. Plaintiff's Motions for Attorneys' Fees are GRANTED in FULL as to fees, and GRANTED in PART as to costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/19/2013. (dmn)
March 1, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Crop Production Services Inc 32 Judgment in favor of plaintiff, Crop Production Services, Inc. Plaintiff is awarded $891,714.14 plus prejudgment interest in the amount of 3% per year dating to April 25, 2011. Nunc pro tunc the 9th day of November, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/1/13. (kpr)
November 9, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the 31 Court's Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiff, CROP PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC. Plaintiff is awarded $891,714.14 plus prejudgment interest in the amount of 3% per year dating to 4/25/2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/9/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crop Production Services Inc v. Gibbs Farming Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veda Agco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibbs-Helton Farms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva Agco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Chevrome Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibbs Farming Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crop Production Services Inc
Represented By: Garland J. Garrett
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Represented By: Karen Turner-Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?