McMillan v. Live Nation Entertainment Inc et al
Plaintiff: Corey McMillan
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Inc and Ticketmaster LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00332
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: 55 Joint Motion to Dismiss; dismissing this case with prejudice; denying all pending motions as moot; and, directing the Clerk of Court to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/24/2012. (dmn)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION ARKANSAS SUPREME COURT re 32 Certification of Issue to State Court re 41 Per Curiam Order. Signed by Judge Karen R. Baker on 4/19/12. (kpr)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PER CURIAM ORDER re: notice of acceptance of certification from Supreme Court of Arkansas re 32 Certification of Issue to State Court. Petitioner's brief is due 30 days from the date of this per curiam. The Respondents' brief shall be due 30 days after the filing of Petitioner's brief. Petitioner may file a reply brief within 15 days after Respondents' brief is filed. (kpr)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATION ORDER, purs to Rule 6-8 of the Rules of the Supreme Court of the State of Arkansas, this Court certifies to the Supreme Court of Arkansas a question of law that may be determinative of this case. The Clerk is hereby directed to forward this Order to the Supreme Court of Arkansas under his official seal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/12/11. (kpr)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/7/11. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillan v. Live Nation Entertainment Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Kristine Gerhard Baker
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster LLC
Represented By: Kristine Gerhard Baker
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey McMillan
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Rodney P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?