Polk v. Pulaski County Detention Facility et al

Plaintiff: Allen Polk
Defendant: Doc Holladay, Pulaski County Detention Facility, Shawn Smith and Pulaski County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 4:2011cv00407
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/14/12. (hph)
December 30, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 89 Partial Report and Recommendations, and granting 88 Polk's Motion to Dismiss Defendants Brawley and Garza. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/30/2011. (dmn)
December 16, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court now clarifies that Polk's claims against Pulaski County are also dismissed as duplicative. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)
November 4, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 66 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting Polk's request to dismiss his claims against Deputy Brooks. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/11. (kpr)
August 31, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 42 partial recommended disposition; and, denying 41 Polk's Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/2011. (dmn)
July 28, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against the Pulaski County Detention Facility and the Pulaski County Sheriff's Department with prejudice. The claims against deft Villines are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Pulaski County Detention Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?