Ginardi et al v. Frontier Gas Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Ginardi, Ike Lester and Constance Lester
Defendant: Frontier Gas Services LLC, Kinder Morgan Treating LP, Chesapeake Energy Corporation and BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00420
Filed: May 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and denying all pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/11/12. (kpr)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER directing the parties to have the settlement papers finalized by this Wednesday, or the Court will conduct an in-court hearing at 3:00 p.m., this Wednesday, July 11, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/9/12. (kpr)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying 135 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/19/12. (kpr)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re 135 MOTION to Certify Class. The Court is inclined to deny class certification. The Court recommends belaying discovery until the judge can complete a written order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/6/12. (kpr)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 122 Motion to Strike Frontier and Crestwood's Expert Witnesses. Defts are to make experts Doug Rush, Scott Skelton, Jim Malcolm, and Jane Spellman available for a telephone deposition. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/24/12. (kpr)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 98 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/18/12. (kpr)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 101 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/17/12. (kpr)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER ORDER re 80 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Crestwood Arkansas Pipeline LLC. The parties are directed to immediately meet and confer to see if mutually agreeable dates can be set up for the proposed depositions. The problem should be resolved this afternoon, or in the morning. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/15/11. (kpr)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/9/11. (kpr)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 55 56 Motions to Dismiss claims for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/5/11. (kpr)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying in part and granting in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is denied except for its request to dismiss plaintiffs' claim for attorneys' fees, which is granted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/10/11. (kpr)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Limited Admission of Michael P. McGartland. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/16/11. (kpr)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Limited Admission of attorney Paul Berry Cooper, III. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/14/11. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ginardi et al v. Frontier Gas Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Ginardi
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ike Lester
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Lester
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Gas Services LLC
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Treating LP
Represented By: David L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?